There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide anti-retaliation protections for antitrust whistleblowers.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
12/23/2020Became Public Law No: 116-257.
12/23/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020Presented to President.
12/08/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/17/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5904-5905; text: CR S5904-5905)
07/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/23/2020Became Public Law No: 116-257.
12/23/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2020-4:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2020-4:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7007-7008)
12/08/2020-4:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2258.
12/08/2020-4:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7007-7009)
12/08/2020-4:23pmHouseMr. Neguse moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/21/2019-6:13pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/21/2019-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/21/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/17/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5904-5905; text: CR S5904-5905)
07/25/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 163.
07/24/2019SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (0)

As of 01/28/2021 text has not been received for S.2258 - Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2258. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (10/17/2019)

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

This bill prohibits employers from retaliating against certain employees who report criminal antitrust violations to the federal government.

Among other things, the bill sets forth provisions that authorize an employee to seek relief by filing a complaint with the Department of Labor or to bring an action in U.S. district court if the individual alleges discharge or other discrimination by an employer who violates the prohibition against retaliation.