There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide anti-retaliation protections for antitrust whistleblowers.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/17/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5904-5905; text: CR S5904-5905)
07/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
10/21/2019-6:13pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/21/2019-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/21/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/17/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5904-5905; text: CR S5904-5905)
07/25/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 163.
07/24/2019SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Committees (0)

As of 01/27/2020 text has not been received for S.2258 - Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


As of 01/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.2258 - Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2258. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/24/2019)

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019

This bill prohibits employers from retaliating against certain employees who report criminal antitrust violations to the federal government.

Among other things, the bill sets forth provisions that authorize an employee to seek relief by filing a complaint with the Department of Labor or to bring an action in U.S. district court if the individual alleges discharge or other discrimination by an employer who violates the prohibition against retaliation.