There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Empowering Olympic, Paralympic, and Amateur Athletes Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Empowering Olympic, Paralympic, and Amateur Athletes Act of 2020

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Empowering Olympic and Amateur Athletes Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Empowering Olympic and Amateur Athletes Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Ted Stevens Olympic and Amateur Sports Act to provide for congressional oversight of the board of directors of the United States Olympic and Paralympic Committee and to protect amateur athletes from emotional, physical, and sexual abuse, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
10/20/2020Presented to President.
10/01/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
08/04/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/29/2020Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-245.
07/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/20/2020SenatePresented to President.
10/01/2020-2:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2020-2:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5151-5159)
10/01/2020-2:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2330.
10/01/2020-2:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5151-5160)
10/01/2020-2:27pmHouseMs. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/07/2020-10:53amHouseHeld at the desk.
08/07/2020-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
08/07/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/04/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/04/2020SenateS.Amdt.2512 Amendment SA 2512 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/04/2020SenateS.Amdt.2512 Amendment SA 2512 proposed by Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S4696) In the nature of a substitute.
08/04/2020SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S4696)
08/04/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4688-4696)
07/29/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 503.
07/29/2020SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-245.
11/13/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/30/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/30/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Markup by
07/29/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-245

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2330. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/30/2019)

Empowering Olympic and Amateur Athletes Act of 2019

This bill establishes safeguards to protect amateur athletes from abuse, including sexual abuse, by coaches and employees in U.S. Olympic and Paralympic sports.

The bill establishes (1) legislative mechanisms by which Congress can dissolve the Board of Directors of the U.S. Olympic and Paralympic Committee (USOPC) and decertify national governing bodies; and (2) a duty of care that USOPC owes to amateur athletes, including protecting athletes by requiring it to ensure that any allegation of child abuse of an amateur athlete who is a minor is immediately reported to law enforcement.

The bill revises duties of the Office of the Ombudsman regarding the pursuit of abuse claims by the U.S. Center for Safe Sport, confidentiality, and retaliation against an employee or member for disclosing information or seeking assistance in mediation. The USOPC and the national governing bodies shall not interfere in or attempt to influence the outcome of an investigation.

The center shall report to Congress within 72 hours of an attempt to interfere in, or influence the outcome of, an investigation.