There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Grid Modernization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Grid Modernization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the modernization of the electric grid, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
10/24/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-149.
07/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/24/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 270.
Action By: Senate
10/24/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-149.
09/25/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/30/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 07/30/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 07/30/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 02/12/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/30/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
10/24/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-149

As of 09/24/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.2332 - Grid Modernization Act of 2019


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2332. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (10/24/2019)

Grid Modernization Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to conduct a program to modernize the electric grid, including by (1) developing standards to compare the storage capacity, cycle length, capabilities, and reliability of different types of electricity storage; (2) promoting the development of micro-grid systems; (3) facilitating a collaborative process to develop model grid architecture; and (4) ensuring a reliable, resilient, affordable, safe, and secure electric grid. (A micro-grid system means a stand-alone electrical system that uses grid-scale energy storage.)

DOE must also establish a grant program to carry out projects related to the modernization of the electric grid, including the application of technologies to improve observability, advanced controls, and prediction of system performance on the distribution system.