There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Department of Veterans Affairs Information Technology Reform Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Department of Veterans Affairs Information Technology Reform Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Information Technology Reform Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve the management of information technology projects and investments of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4648-4650; text: CR S4648-4650)
02/13/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report.
07/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/07/2020-10:52amHouseHeld at the desk.
08/07/2020-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/30/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4648-4650; text: CR S4648-4650)
02/13/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423.
02/13/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report.
01/29/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/30/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 07/30/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 07/01/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/30/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Markup by
02/13/2020 Reported by

As of 08/12/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.2336 - Department of Veterans Affairs Information Technology Reform Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.