There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Fishery Failures: Urgently Needed Disaster Declarations Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve the Fishery Resource Disaster Relief program of the National Marine Fisheries Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
11/13/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/30/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/12/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 11/13/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/21/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 08/03/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/30/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2346. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/30/2019)

Fishery Failures: Urgently Needed Disaster Declarations Act

This bill revises the review process for making fishery resource disaster determinations.

Among other things, the bill

  • maintains the authority of the Department of Commerce to determine the existence of a fishery disaster;
  • sets forth requirements for initiating a request for a fishery resource disaster review;
  • provides a 120-day time frame for Commerce to evaluate a request, beginning either upon receipt or at the close of the fishery season, if the fishery season closes;
  • establishes criteria for Commerce to use when making a determination about whether a fishery resource disaster has occurred; and
  • lists eligible uses of fishery disaster relief funds, including for habitat conservation and restoration that reduce adverse impacts to a fishery.