There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in recognition of Christa McAuliffe.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/28/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/28/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/28/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/25/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/23/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/03/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/03/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/05/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/10/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/10/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/10/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/10/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 06/10/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/10/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/10/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/11/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/11/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/11/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 06/11/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/11/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 06/11/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/11/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/11/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/11/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 06/11/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/11/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/11/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/11/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/11/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/11/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/11/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/11/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/11/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/11/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/11/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 06/11/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/11/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/11/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 06/11/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/11/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/11/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/11/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/11/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 06/11/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/11/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/11/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/11/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 06/12/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/12/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/12/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/12/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/12/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/12/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/12/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/12/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 06/13/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 06/13/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/13/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/13/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/13/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/13/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/18/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 06/18/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/18/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/18/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/18/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.239. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/28/2019)

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue not more than 350,000 $1 silver coins in commemoration of Christa McAuliffe, a teacher tragically killed in the Space Shuttle Challenger Disaster.

The design of the coins shall bear an image and the name of Christa McAuliffe on the obverse side and a design on the reverse side that depicts the legacy of McAuliffe as a teacher.

Treasury may issue the coins from January 1-December 31, 2020.

All surcharges received by Treasury from the sale of the coins shall be paid to the FIRST robotics program for the purpose of engaging and inspiring young people, through mentor-based programs, to become leaders in the fields of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.