There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in recognition of Christa McAuliffe.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/09/2019Became Public Law No: 116-65.
10/09/2019Signed by President.
09/27/2019Presented to President.
09/19/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7796-7797)
07/09/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(text: CR S4739)
07/09/2019Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/28/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/09/2019Became Public Law No: 116-65.
10/09/2019Signed by President.
09/27/2019SenatePresented to President.
09/19/2019-4:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/19/2019-4:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7796-7797)
09/19/2019-3:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 239.
09/19/2019-3:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7796-7800)
09/19/2019-3:35pmHouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/10/2019-4:54pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/10/2019-12:27pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/10/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/09/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4739)
07/09/2019SenateS.Amdt.907 Amendment SA 907 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/09/2019SenateS.Amdt.907 Amendment SA 907 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Shaheen. (consideration: CR S4739; text: CR S4739) To improve the bill.
07/09/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4739)
07/09/2019SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/28/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/28/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/25/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/23/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/03/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/03/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/05/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/10/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/10/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/10/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/10/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 06/10/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/10/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/10/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/11/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/11/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/11/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 06/11/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/11/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 06/11/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/11/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/11/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/11/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 06/11/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/11/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/11/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/11/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/11/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/11/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/11/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/11/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/11/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/11/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/11/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 06/11/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/11/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/11/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 06/11/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/11/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/11/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/11/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/11/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 06/11/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/11/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/11/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/11/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 06/12/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/12/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/12/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/12/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/12/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/12/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/12/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/12/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 06/13/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 06/13/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/13/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/13/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/13/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/13/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/18/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 06/18/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/18/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/18/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/18/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/18/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/19/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 06/19/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/19/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 06/24/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/24/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/24/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 06/25/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/26/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/27/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 07/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/28/2019 Referred to
07/09/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.239. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (07/09/2019)

Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue not more than 350,000 $1 silver coins in commemoration of Christa McAuliffe, a teacher tragically killed in the Space Shuttle Challenger Disaster.

(Sec. 4) The design of the coins shall bear an image and the name of Christa McAuliffe on the obverse side and a design on the reverse side that depicts the legacy of McAuliffe as a teacher.

(Sec. 5) Treasury may issue the coins from January 1-December 31, 2021.

(Sec. 7) All surcharges received by Treasury from the sale of the coins shall be paid to the FIRST robotics program for the purpose of engaging and inspiring young people, through mentor-based programs, to become leaders in the fields of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.