There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Government Employee Fair Treatment Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Government Employee Fair Treatment Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Government Employee Fair Treatment Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Government Employee Fair Treatment Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the compensation of Federal and other government employees affected by lapses in appropriations.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
01/16/2019Became Public Law No: 116-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2019Signed by President.
01/14/2019Presented to President.
01/11/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 7 (Roll no. 28).(text: CR H498)
01/10/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S133-134; text: CR S133-134)
01/03/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
01/16/2019Became Public Law No: 116-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2019Signed by President.
01/14/2019SenatePresented to President.
01/11/2019-12:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/11/2019-12:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 7 (Roll no. 28). (text: CR H498)
01/11/2019-12:04pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H503-504)
01/11/2019-11:28amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/11/2019-10:51amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 24.
01/11/2019-10:51amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H498-502)
01/11/2019-10:50amHouseMr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/10/2019-6:32pmHouseHeld at the desk.
01/10/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/10/2019-6:18pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/10/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S133-134; text: CR S133-134)
01/04/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 3.
01/03/2019SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/03/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/08/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/08/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 01/08/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/08/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/08/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/08/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/08/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/08/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/08/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 01/09/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 01/10/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/10/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 01/10/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 01/10/2019

Committees (0)

As of 09/19/2019 text has not been received for S.24 - Government Employee Fair Treatment Act of 2019

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


As of 09/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.24 - Government Employee Fair Treatment Act of 2019


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.24. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-1 (01/16/2019)

Government Employee Fair Treatment Act of 2019

This bill requires employees of the federal government or a District of Columbia public employer who are furloughed or required to work during a lapse in appropriations beginning on or after December 22, 2018, to be compensated for the period of the lapse. The employees must be compensated on the earliest date possible after the lapse ends, regardless of scheduled pay dates. Employees required to work during the lapse in appropriations may use leave.