Text: S.2414 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/01/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 2414


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the Health Coverage Tax Credit.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

August 1, 2019

Mr. Portman (for himself, Mr. Brown, and Mr. Casey) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the Health Coverage Tax Credit.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Extension of Health Coverage Tax Credit.

(a) In general.—Subparagraph (B) of section 35(b)(1) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “January 1, 2020” and inserting “January 1, 2025”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by this section shall apply to coverage months beginning after December 31, 2019.