There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

CHP Support Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

CHP Support Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to establish the CHP Technical Assistance Partnership Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/28/2020By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-209.
12/17/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report.
08/01/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
01/28/2020By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-209.
Action By: Senate
12/17/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 354.
Action By: Senate
12/17/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report.
11/19/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
11/06/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 116-344.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
08/01/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 08/01/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources08/01/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-209
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy11/06/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2425. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (12/17/2019)

CHP Support Act of 2019

This bill redesignates the Department of Energy's Clean Energy Application Centers as the CHP Technical Assistance Partnership Program and reauthorizes the program through FY2024. The program encourages deployment of combined heat and power, heat to power, and efficient district energy technologies. The program also provides project specific support to building and industrial professionals through economic and engineering assessments and advisory activities.