There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of State to develop a strategy to regain observer status for Taiwan in the World Health Organization, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/11/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/29/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/12/2020-12:19pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/12/2020-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/12/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/11/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2346-2347)
05/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/11/2020SenateS.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S2346-2347; text: CR S2346-2347) In the nature of a substitute.
05/11/2020SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2346)
05/11/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2345-2347)
06/03/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 100.
06/03/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/22/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/29/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (23)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/29/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
06/03/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.249. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (05/11/2020)

This bill directs the Department of State to include additional information in its annual reports concerning Taiwan's participation at the World Health Organization's World Health Assembly (WHA) as an observer. The report shall describe changes and improvements to the State Department's plan to support Taiwan's observer status at the WHA, following any meetings at which Taiwan did not participate under such status. (China has opposed Taiwan's participation, based on its position that Taiwan is part of China and not a separate country.)

The State Department shall regularly report to Congress on U.S. actions and plans to strengthen Taiwan's official and unofficial diplomatic relationships around the world.