There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Small Business Child Care Investment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to allow nonprofit child care providers to participate in the loan programs of the Small Business Administration.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/25/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/23/2020Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
09/25/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 09/25/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/26/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 11/19/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 12/19/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship09/25/2019 Referred to
07/23/2020 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2549. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/25/2019)

Small Business Child Care Investment Act

This bill deems certain nonprofit child care providers to be small business concerns so that they may participate in loan programs administered by the Small Business Administration.