There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

PROTECT Act of 2019
Protecting Resources On The Electric grid with Cybersecurity Technology Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

PROTECT Act of 2019
Protecting Resources On The Electric grid with Cybersecurity Technology Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Power Act to provide energy cybersecurity investment incentives, to establish a grant and technical assistance program for cybersecurity investments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/07/2020By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-196.
12/17/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/26/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
01/07/2020By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-196.
Action By: Senate
12/17/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 356.
Action By: Senate
12/17/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/19/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/06/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 116-344.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
09/26/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/26/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 12/19/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/26/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-196
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy11/06/2019 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.2556.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2556. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (12/17/2019)

Protecting Resources On The Electric grid with Cybersecurity Technology Act of 2019 or the PROTECT Act of 2019

This bill addresses providing incentives for electric utilities to invest in cybersecurity.

Specifically, the bill

  • directs the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) to provide incentives to electric utilities for investing in advanced cybersecurity technology, and
  • establishes a grant and technical assistance program at the Department of Energy for electric utilities that are not regulated by FERC to deploy advanced cybersecurity technology.