There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Big Cat Public Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to clarify provisions enacted by the Captive Wildlife Safety Act, to further the conservation of certain wildlife species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
09/26/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 09/26/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/29/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/20/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 12/04/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/10/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/06/2020
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 02/04/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/05/2020
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 05/04/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/04/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/12/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 09/08/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/08/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/08/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 09/21/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 09/21/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/24/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/29/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/29/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/29/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/29/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/19/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 10/19/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/20/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/10/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/30/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/02/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 12/11/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/14/2020
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/16/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/18/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/01/2021

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works09/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2561. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/26/2019)

Big Cat Public Safety Act

This bill revises requirements governing the trade of big cats (i.e., species of lion, tiger, leopard, cheetah, jaguar, or cougar or any hybrid of such species). Specifically, it revises restrictions on the possession and exhibition of big cats, including to restrict direct contact between the public and big cats.