There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Tribal HUD-VASH Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Tribal HUD-VASH Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Tribal HUD-VASH Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for rental assistance for homeless or at-risk Indian veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/27/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4662-4663)
03/28/2019Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-21.
01/29/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
06/28/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
06/28/2019-3:32pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/28/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/27/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4662-4663)
03/28/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49.
03/28/2019SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-21.
02/06/2019SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/29/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (9)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/29/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 01/29/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/29/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/05/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 02/05/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/07/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 02/12/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/27/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 05/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs01/29/2019 Referred to
02/06/2019 Markup by
03/28/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-21
House Financial Services06/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.