There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to strengthen employee cost savings suggestions programs within the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/09/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-231. Minority views filed.
10/17/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/09/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 478.
Action By: Senate
06/09/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-231. Minority views filed.
11/06/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/17/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 10/17/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 10/17/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 10/17/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 10/17/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 10/17/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 10/22/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/22/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/28/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/17/2019 Referred to
11/06/2019 Markup by
06/09/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-231

No related bill information was received for S.2618.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2618. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (06/09/2020)

Bonuses for Cost-Cutters Act of 2019

This bill temporarily expands the awards program for cost-saving identifications by federal employees of fraud, waste, or mismanagement to include identifications of surplus salaries and expenses funds.

Savings resulting from such identifications shall generally be used for deficit reduction, but agencies may retain up to 10% of such savings for the purpose of paying cash awards to employees for making the identifications. An officer may not receive such award if the officer (1) serves in a position at level one of the Executive Schedule; (2) is the head of an agency; or (3) is a commissioner, board member, or other voting member of an independent establishment.