There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

End Double Taxation of Successful Civil Claims Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow an above-the-line deduction for attorney fees and costs in connection with civil claim awards.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/17/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
10/17/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 10/17/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 10/17/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/14/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/12/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 12/16/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/17/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 02/13/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance10/17/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2627.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2627. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/17/2019)

End Double Taxation of Successful Civil Claims Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to expand the deduction from gross income (above-the-line deduction) for attorney fees and court costs to include such fees and costs paid in connection with any legal action involving a civil claim (currently, limited to actions involving unlawful discrimination, the False Claims Act, and Medicare payments).