There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2020

Other Short Titles

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a task force to assist States in implementing hiring requirements for child care staff members to improve child safety.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/31/2020Became Public Law No: 116-279. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2020Signed by President.
12/21/2020Presented to President.
12/19/2020Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2683 by Voice Vote.
09/16/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
03/05/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1612)
12/17/2019Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/23/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/31/2020Became Public Law No: 116-279. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2020Signed by President.
12/21/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/20/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2020SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2683 by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7853)
09/17/2020SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
09/16/2020-11:43amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2020-11:43amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4447-4448)
09/16/2020-11:31amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2683.
09/16/2020-11:31amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4447-4449)
09/16/2020-11:30amHouseMrs. McBath moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/09/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
03/09/2020-2:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/09/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/05/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1612)
03/05/2020SenateS.Amdt.1522 Amendment SA 1522 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/05/2020SenateS.Amdt.1522 Amendment SA 1522 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S1611-1612; text: CR S1612) In the nature of a substitute.
03/05/2020SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
03/05/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1611-1612)
12/17/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 370.
12/17/2019SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
12/12/2019SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/23/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 10/23/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/10/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 12/10/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 12/11/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 12/11/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions10/23/2019 Referred to
12/12/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by
House Education and Labor03/09/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for S.2683. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-279 (12/31/2020)

Child Care Protection Improvement Act of 2020

This bill establishes an interagency task force, chaired by the Administration for Children and Families, to support states in conducting required criminal background checks for childcare staff members. Specifically, the task force must consult with relevant state agencies and develop recommendations and best practices. This includes evaluating how agencies are responding to interstate requests for information about staff, or prospective staff, who have lived in another state within the preceding five years. The task force must submit a final report with its recommendations within one year of the first meeting of the task force.