There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

READI Act
Reliable Emergency Alert Distribution Improvement Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

READI Act
Reliable Emergency Alert Distribution Improvement Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

READI Act
Reliable Emergency Alert Distribution Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve oversight by the Federal Communications Commission of the wireless and broadcast emergency alert systems.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5881-5882)
07/21/2020Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-240.
10/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/29/2020-9:36pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/29/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2020-3:11pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/24/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5881-5882)
09/24/2020SenateS.Amdt.2669 Amendment SA 2669 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/24/2020SenateS.Amdt.2669 Amendment SA 2669 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Schatz. (consideration: CR S5881-5882; text: CR S5881-5882) In the nature of a substitute.
09/24/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5881-5882)
07/21/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492.
07/21/2020SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-240.
11/13/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/24/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 10/24/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/17/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 08/06/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/24/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Markup by
07/21/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-240

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.