There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

OCEAN Research Act
Ocean, Coastal, and Estuarine Acidification Necessitates Research Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Federal Ocean Acidification Research and Monitoring Act of 2009, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
10/24/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 10/24/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/18/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/20/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 12/04/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/21/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/24/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.