There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit the commercial export of covered munitions items to the Hong Kong Police Force.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-77. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2019Signed by President.
11/21/2019Presented to President.
11/20/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 636).(text: CR H9096)
11/19/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6661)
11/19/2019Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
11/27/2019Became Public Law No: 116-77. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2019Signed by President.
11/21/2019SenatePresented to President.
11/20/2019-5:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/20/2019-5:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 636). (text: CR H9096)
11/20/2019-5:13pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9100-9101)
11/20/2019-4:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/20/2019-4:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2710.
11/20/2019-4:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9096-9098)
11/20/2019-4:06pmHouseMr. Sherman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/20/2019-12:38pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/20/2019-12:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/19/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6661)
11/19/2019SenateS.Amdt.1248 Amendment SA 1248 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/2019SenateS.Amdt.1247 Amendment SA 1247 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/2019SenateS.Amdt.1248 Amendment SA 1248 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S6661; text: CR S6661) To provide a one-year sunset.
11/19/2019SenateS.Amdt.1247 Amendment SA 1247 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S6661; text: CR S6661) To include the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs of the Senate as part of the notification requirement.
11/19/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6661)
11/19/2019SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/24/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Discharged from

As of 01/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.2710 - A bill to prohibit the commercial export of covered munitions items to the Hong Kong Police Force.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2710. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-77 (11/27/2019)

This bill directs the President to prohibit the issuance of licenses to export specified munitions items to the Hong Kong Police Force and the Hong Kong Auxiliary Police Force. The specified items include tear gas, rubber bullets, and handcuffs. The President may make an exception upon certifying to Congress as to how such exports are important to U.S. national interests and foreign policy goals. This prohibition shall expire one year after the bill's enactment.