There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7866-7867; text: CR S7866-7867)
12/15/2020Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment. With written report No. 116-324.
10/28/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/21/2020-6:40pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/21/2020-6:12pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/21/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7866-7867; text: CR S7866-7867)
12/15/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 627.
12/15/2020SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment. With written report No. 116-324.
07/29/2020SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/24/2020SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
10/28/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 10/28/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Indian Affairs10/28/2019 Referred to
06/24/2020 Hearings by
07/29/2020 Markup by
12/15/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-324

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2716. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (12/20/2020)

This bill revises the land claims of the Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon. In particular, the bill specifies that only the tribe's claims to the 84 acres of land known as the Thompson Strip, rather than the tribe's claims to any lands within Oregon, are extinguished.

Additionally, the bill prohibits gaming on any real property obtained by the tribe as part of a land claim settlement approved by the United States.