There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

CONNECT for Health Act of 2019
Creating Opportunities Now for Necessary and Effective Care Technologies (CONNECT) for Health Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to expand access to telehealth services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
10/30/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 10/30/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 10/30/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 10/30/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 10/30/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 10/30/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 11/14/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 11/14/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/14/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 11/14/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/14/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/14/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/14/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 11/14/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/14/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 11/14/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 11/19/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/19/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/21/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/21/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 12/02/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 12/02/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/02/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 12/02/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 12/09/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 12/09/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 12/11/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/11/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 12/12/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 12/12/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 12/19/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 12/19/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/16/2020
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 01/16/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/15/2020
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/15/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/24/2020
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/24/2020
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/29/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance10/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2741. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/30/2019)

Creating Opportunities Now for Necessary and Effective Care Technologies for Health Act of 2019 or the CONNECT for Health Act of 2019

This bill expands coverage of telehealth services under Medicare.

Among other things, the bill

  • allows the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to waive certain restrictions, such as geographic restrictions, for services provided in high-need health professional shortage areas;
  • excludes mental health and emergency medical services, as well as services provided at rural health clinics, federally qualified health centers, and Indian Health Service facilities, from such geographic restrictions; and
  • allows the CMS to generally waive coverage restrictions during national emergencies.

Additionally, the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission must report on information relating to the access of Medicare beneficiaries to telehealth services at home. The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation may also test alternative payment models relating to expanded telehealth services.