There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the China Censorship Monitor and Action Group, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
10/30/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 10/30/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 11/19/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 12/19/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/28/2020
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/28/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/10/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations10/30/2019 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2743.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2743. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/30/2019)

This bill establishes the interagency China Censorship Monitor and Action Group. The group shall compile and maintain a public database of instances of China's government punishing a U.S. company for the company's exercise of free speech.