There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veteran Treatment Court Coordination Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Veteran Treatment Court Coordination Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Attorney General to establish and carry out a Veteran Treatment Court Program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7120-7121)
12/17/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7120-7121)
11/05/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2019-5:58pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2019-11:05amHouseReceived in the House.
12/17/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7120-7121)
12/17/2019SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7120-7121)
11/05/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 11/05/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 11/05/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 11/05/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 11/05/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 11/19/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 12/02/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/12/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 01/15/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary11/05/2019 Referred to
12/17/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2774. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (12/17/2019)

Veteran Treatment Court Coordination Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of Justice to establish a Veterans Treatment Court Program to provide grants and technical assistance for state, local, and tribal governments to develop and maintain veterans treatment courts.