There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

TOD Advancement Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

TOD Advancement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve transit-oriented development financing, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
08/12/2020Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-255.
11/06/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
08/12/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 516.
Action By: Senate
08/12/2020Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-255.
11/13/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
11/06/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 11/06/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 11/06/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/07/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 11/14/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/14/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 11/19/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/06/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Markup by
08/12/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-255

No related bill information was received for S.2805.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2805. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (08/12/2020)

TOD Advancement Act of 2019

This bill revises and extends until December 4, 2021, the Railroad Rehabilitation Improvement and Financing program.

Specifically, the bill revises program purposes to include financing economic development and infrastructure that (1) incorporates private investment of greater than 20% of total project costs; (2) is physically connected to, or within one half mile walking distance from, a passenger rail station or minimodal station that includes rail services; (3) will commerce construction within 90 days after the loan or loan guarantee is obligated for the project; and (4) demonstrates the ability to generate new financial assistance for the relevant passenger rail station or service.

The bill requires the Department of Transportation to periodically report to Congress on the number of applications for loans and loan guarantees under the program.