There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Sergeant Daniel Somers Veterans Network of Support Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Sergeant Daniel Somers Veterans Network of Support Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Sergeant Daniel Somers Veterans Network of Support Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program on information sharing between the Department of Veterans Affairs and designated relatives and friends of veterans regarding the assistance and benefits available to the veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/30/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4080-4081; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S4080-4081)
02/05/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/01/2020-6:05pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/01/2020-5:24pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/01/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/30/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4080-4081; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S4080-4081)
02/05/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 414.
02/05/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/29/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/14/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 11/14/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 11/14/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 11/14/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 01/28/2020
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 06/24/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs11/14/2019 Referred to
01/29/2020 Markup by
02/05/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2864. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/30/2020)

Sergeant Daniel Somers Veterans Network of Support Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a two-year pilot program on information sharing between the VA and designated persons regarding the assistance and benefits available to veterans. Under the program, volunteer participants who are in the Armed Forces and are transitioning to civilian life shall designate up to 10 persons to receive information on specified services and benefits from the VA.