There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Physician Workforce Production Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to support rural residency training funding that is equitable for all States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/31/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/31/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/31/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 01/31/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 03/05/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/09/2019
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/08/2019 05/09/2019 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/31/2019 Referred to

As of 05/19/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.289 - Rural Physician Workforce Production Act of 2019.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.