There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

CONTRACT Act of 2019
Continuity for Operators with Necessary Training Required for ATC Contract Towers Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for a full annuity supplement for certain air traffic controllers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/19/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
12/11/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/19/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 11/19/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/19/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/20/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/21/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/21/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/02/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/03/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/03/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/03/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 12/04/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/04/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/05/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 12/05/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 12/05/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 12/09/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 12/09/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/09/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/09/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 12/09/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 12/09/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/09/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/09/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 12/09/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 12/10/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/11/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 12/12/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 12/12/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 12/12/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 12/12/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 12/17/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/17/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/18/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 01/09/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/28/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 02/04/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/24/2020
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/24/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 03/03/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/12/2020
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/25/2020
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 05/05/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 07/21/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 07/28/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 08/12/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/19/2019 Referred to
12/11/2019 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2898. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/19/2019)

Continuity for Operators with Necessary Training Required for ATC Contract Towers Act of 2019 or the CONTRACT Act of 2019

This bill exempts certain air traffic controllers from a required reduction in their retirement annuity payment on account of earnings from certain work performed while entitled to such annuity.

Under current law, retired Federal Aviation Administration air traffic controllers receive an annuity payment during the period between the mandatory retirement age of 56 and the social security minimum age of 62. Such annuity payment is required to be reduced by a certain percentage of any excess earnings during this period.

The bill exempts from such reduction in annuity payments an air traffic controller who participates in the Air Traffic Control Contract Program (a public-private partnership for air traffic control services) following mandatory retirement.