There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Blackwater Trading Post Land Transfer Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Blackwater Trading Post Land Transfer Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to take certain land located in Pinal County, Arizona, into trust for the benefit of the Gila River Indian Community, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/2020Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-270.
11/20/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/24/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557.
Action By: Senate
09/24/2020Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-270.
07/29/2020Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/24/2020Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
11/20/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 11/20/2019
Sen. Kelly, Mark [D-AZ] 12/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Indian Affairs11/20/2019 Referred to
06/24/2020 Hearings by
07/29/2020 Markup by
09/24/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-270

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2912. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (09/24/2020)

Blackwater Trading Post Land Transfer Act

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to take the 55.3 acres of land of the Blackwater Trading Post in Pinal County, Arizona, which is bordered and owned by the Gila River Indian Community, into trust for the benefit of the community after it (1) conveys to Interior all of its interest in such land, and (2) submits a request for Interior to take such land into trust for it.

The land that is taken into trust shall be treated as part of the community's reservation.

The bill prohibits gaming on any of the land taken into trust.