There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Chiropractic Health Parity for Military Beneficiaries Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Defense to develop and implement a plan to provide chiropractic health care services for certain covered beneficiaries as part of the TRICARE program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/08/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/08/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/08/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/22/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 01/28/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/29/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/30/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/30/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services01/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.30. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/08/2019)

Chiropractic Health Parity for Military Beneficiaries Act

This bill directs the Department of Defense to provide chiropractic health care services and benefits through the TRICARE program to uniformed service members who are not on active duty and to uniformed service retirees. (Active duty members of the uniformed services are currently eligible for chiropractic services and benefits through the Chiropractic Health Care Program.)