There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Promoting Aviation Regulations for Technical Training (PARTT) 147 Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to modernize training programs at aviation maintenance technician schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
12/12/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 12/12/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 12/12/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 12/12/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/17/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/16/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 03/09/2020
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/01/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/08/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3043. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (12/12/2019)

Promoting Aviation Regulations for Technical Training (PARTT) 147 Act of 2019

This bill directs the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to establish requirements for issuing aviation maintenance technician school certificates and associated ratings.

Among other requirements, the bill

  • sets forth application requirements for a certificate to operate an aviation maintenance technician school, including that applications must include a description of the manner in which the school's curriculum will ensure students are capable of attaining a mechanic certificate and associated ratings;
  • establishes facility and instructor requirements for each school;
  • directs each school to establish and maintain a quality control system that provides procedures for recordkeeping, assessment, issuing credit for experience, issuing of final course grades, ensuring sufficient number of instructors, granting of graduation documentation, and corrective action for addressing deficiencies; and
  • requires schools to maintain a pass rate of at least 70% for students who take the written, oral, or practical (or any combination thereof) FAA mechanic tests.