There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to modify the limitation on pay for certain high-level employees and officers of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
07/02/2020Became Public Law No: 116-146. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/2020Signed by President.
06/22/2020Presented to President.
06/08/2020Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.
06/04/2020Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.
05/28/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2329)
01/16/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2020Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/02/2020Became Public Law No: 116-146. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/2020Signed by President.
06/22/2020SenatePresented to President.
06/11/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/08/2020SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2769)
06/04/2020SenateSenate vitiated previous action of 06/04/2020 by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2745)
06/04/2020SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2745)
06/01/2020SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
05/28/2020-9:44amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/28/2020-9:44amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2329)
05/28/2020-9:33amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3084.
05/28/2020-9:33amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2329-2330)
05/28/2020-9:33amHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/12/2020HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/12/2020HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/17/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
01/17/2020-10:32amHouseReceived in the House.
01/16/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/16/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S262)
01/16/2020SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S262)
12/18/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 12/18/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/18/2019 Referred to
01/16/2020 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs01/17/2020 Referred to
03/12/2020 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.3084. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-146 (07/02/2020)

This bill excludes certain appointed positions within the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) from current executive schedule salary caps. Specifically, the current salary caps do not apply for (1) appointed directors of VA medical centers, (2) appointed directors of Veterans Integrated Service Networks, and (3) appointees of the Office of the Under Secretary for Health. The bill authorizes the VA to waive the salary limitations on such employees who were appointed during the period beginning on November 1, 2010, and ending on the day before the enactment of this bill.