There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

DHS Cyber Hunt and Incident Response Teams Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

DHS Cyber Hunt and Incident Response Teams Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize cyber hunt and incident response teams at the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/08/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-27.
01/31/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/08/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 62.
Action By: Senate
04/08/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-27.
02/13/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/31/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/31/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/07/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/31/2019 Referred to
02/13/2019 Markup by
04/08/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-27

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.315. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (04/08/2019)

DHS Cyber Hunt and Incident Response Teams Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security's National Cybersecurity and Communications Integration Center to maintain cyber-hunt and incident-response teams to assist with activities such as restoring services following a cyber incident and identifying cybersecurity risks and unauthorized cyber activity.