There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 and the United States-Israel Strategic Partnership Act of 2014 to make improvements to certain defense and security assistance provisions and to authorize the appropriations of funds to Israel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/03/2020Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/09/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/03/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 463.
Action By: Senate
06/03/2020Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/21/2020Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/09/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/09/2020
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/28/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/28/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 01/28/2020
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 01/28/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 01/28/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 01/28/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/28/2020
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/28/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/28/2020
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 01/28/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 02/11/2020
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 02/11/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/11/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 02/11/2020
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 02/11/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/11/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/11/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/11/2020
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/25/2020
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 02/25/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/25/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 02/25/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/25/2020
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 02/25/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/27/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 03/04/2020
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/04/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/04/2020
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 03/04/2020
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/04/2020
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/05/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/05/2020
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/05/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 05/20/2020
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/17/2020
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/22/2020
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/27/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 09/09/2020
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/14/2020
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/21/2020
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 09/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations01/09/2020 Referred to
05/21/2020 Markup by
06/03/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3176. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (06/03/2020)

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020

This bill provides for security assistance to Israel and authorizes actions to further U.S.-Israel cooperation.

Specifically, under the Foreign Military Financing Program, the bill makes no less than $3.3 billion annually available to Israel through FY2028. The bill also extends through FY2025 (1) authority to stockpile war reserves in Israel, and (2) loan guarantees to Israel for up to $9 billion.

The President is authorized to transfer munitions from reserve stocks to Israel for its self-defense. Further, the President must describe steps taken to include Israel in the list of countries eligible for the strategic trade authorization exception, which authorizes exports, reexports, and in-country transfers in lieu of a license that would otherwise be required. Lastly, the President must establish and update contingency plans to provide Israel with defense articles and services necessary for its defense.

The Department of State is authorized to (1) enter into memoranda of understanding with Israel with a focus on strengthening mutual ties and cooperation with nations throughout the world; and (2) establish a program between the United States, Israel, and other countries or territories to provide for cooperation in the Middle East region by financing and cooperating in programs related to innovation and advanced technologies. Further, the United States is authorized to enter into cooperative agreements with Israel and developing countries to identify and support local solutions for addressing sustainability challenges.

The State Department is authorized to carry out activities with Israel to establish directed energy capabilities that address threats to the United States, deployed forces of the United States, or Israel.

The bill authorizes cooperation on additional specified matters, including (1) health technologies, (2) civilian science and technology programs, and (3) space exploration and science initiatives.