There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 and the United States-Israel Strategic Partnership Act of 2014 to make improvements to certain defense and security assistance provisions and to authorize the appropriations of funds to Israel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/09/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/21/2020Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/09/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/09/2020
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/28/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/28/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 01/28/2020
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 01/28/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 01/28/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 01/28/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/28/2020
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/28/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/28/2020
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 01/28/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 02/11/2020
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 02/11/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/11/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 02/11/2020
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 02/11/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/11/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/11/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/11/2020
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/25/2020
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 02/25/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/25/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 02/25/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/25/2020
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 02/25/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/27/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 03/04/2020
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/04/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/04/2020
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 03/04/2020
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/04/2020
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/05/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/05/2020
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/05/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 05/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/09/2020 Referred to
05/21/2020 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.