There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Temporary Reauthorization and Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Analogues Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Temporary Reauthorization and Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Analogues Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Temporary Reauthorization and Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Analogues Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Temporary Reauthorization and Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Analogues Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the temporary scheduling order for fentanyl-related substances, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2020Became Public Law No: 116-114. (TXT | PDF)
02/06/2020Signed by President.
02/03/2020Presented to President.
01/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 320 - 88 (Roll no. 32).
01/16/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/06/2020Became Public Law No: 116-114. (TXT | PDF)
02/06/2020Signed by President.
02/03/2020SenatePresented to President.
01/29/2020-7:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/29/2020-7:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 320 - 88 (Roll no. 32). (text: CR H647)
01/29/2020-7:14pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H701-702)
01/29/2020-1:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/29/2020-12:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3201.
01/29/2020-12:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H647-653)
01/29/2020-12:26pmHouseMs. Kuster (NH) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/28/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/21/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/17/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/17/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/17/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/17/2020-10:32amHouseReceived in the House.
01/16/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/16/2020SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S261-262; text: CR S261-262)

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/16/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 01/16/2020
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/16/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/16/2020
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/16/2020
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/16/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/17/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/21/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary01/17/2020 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security01/28/2020 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/17/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.3201.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3201. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-114 (02/06/2020)

Temporary Reauthorization and Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Analogues Act

This bill extends until May 6, 2021, the temporary scheduling order issued by the Drug Enforcement Administration to place fentanyl-related substances in schedule I of the Controlled Substances Act. The temporary order expires on February 6, 2020.

Additionally, the bill directs the Government Accountability Office to study and report on the classification of fentanyl-related substances as schedule I controlled substances, research on fentanyl-related substances, and the importation of fentanyl-related substances into the United States.