There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Safeguarding Americans' Private Records Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 to protect privacy rights, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/28/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/28/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/28/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/13/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/02/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/10/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/10/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary01/28/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3242. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/28/2020)

Safeguarding Americans' Private Records Act of 2020

This bill imposes limitations on investigative powers provided under the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 (FISA), reauthorizes certain FISA programs, and makes related changes.

Provisions include

  • reauthorizing to December 15, 2023, FISA authority to obtain business records, but also repealing the power to use such authority to obtain records on an ongoing basis;
  • excluding certain data, such as cell phone location, from FISA authority to access business records;
  • establishing that nonpublic information collected under FISA authority may not be retained for more than three years unless the information includes foreign intelligence information;
  • disallowing the use of FISA-collected business records for criminal, civil, or administrative proceedings except in certain instances, such as cases involving a specific cybersecurity threat from a foreign country;
  • requiring a government entity to notify a targeted person that the entity intends to use in court business records collected under FISA;
  • excluding cell site location and global positioning system information from FISA authority for using a pen register or trap and trace device to collect evidence;
  • reauthorizing to December 15, 2023, the power to treat individual terrorists as foreign agents;
  • expanding the powers of FISA court amicus curiae (outside parties appointed to assist in a case), such as by authorizing the amicus to refer a FISA court decision to the FISA Court of Review; and
  • repealing the government's authority to use National Security Letters to obtain financial or communications records without a court order.