There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Wounded Veterans Recreation Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Wounded Veterans Recreation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Wounded Veterans Recreation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Lands Recreation Enhancement Act to provide for a lifetime National Recreational Pass for any veteran with a service-connected disability.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/22/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3129; text: CR S3129)
12/17/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/04/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/24/2020-2:50pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/24/2020-2:08pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/24/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/22/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3129; text: CR S3129)
12/17/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
12/17/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
12/12/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
02/04/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/04/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/24/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/18/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/04/2019 Referred to
12/12/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks06/19/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.327. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/04/2019)

Wounded Veterans Recreation Act

This bill instructs the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture to make the National Parks and Federal Recreational Lands Pass available, without charge and for the lifetime of the passholder, to any veteran who has been found to have a compensable or noncompensable service-connected disability.