There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Homeland Security to work with cybersecurity consortia for training, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6768; text: CR S6768)
03/12/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-5.
02/05/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
12/04/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
11/26/2019-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/21/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6768; text: CR S6768)
03/12/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
03/12/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-5.
02/13/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/05/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/05/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 02/05/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/05/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/05/2019 Referred to
02/13/2019 Markup by
03/12/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-5
House Homeland Security11/26/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation12/04/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.333. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (11/21/2019)

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2019

This bill allows the Department of Homeland Security to work together with a consortium composed of nonprofit entities to develop, update, and deliver cybersecurity training in support of homeland security.