There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize major medical facility projects for the Department of Veterans Affairs for fiscal year 2020, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
06/16/2020Became Public Law No: 116-144. (TXT | PDF)
06/16/2020Signed by President.
06/08/2020Presented to President.
05/28/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2328)
03/05/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1613-1614; text: CR S1614)
03/05/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/16/2020Became Public Law No: 116-144. (TXT | PDF)
06/16/2020Signed by President.
06/08/2020SenatePresented to President.
05/28/2020-9:32amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/28/2020-9:32amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2328)
05/28/2020-9:26amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3414.
05/28/2020-9:26amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2328-2329)
05/28/2020-9:26amHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/09/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/09/2020-2:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/09/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/05/2020SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1613-1614; text: CR S1614)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/05/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/09/2020 Referred to

As of 08/09/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.3414 - Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2020


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3414. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-144 (06/16/2020)

Major Medical Facility Authorization Act of 2020

This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs to carry out specified major medical facility projects during FY2020. The bill also indicates the maximum amount that can be spent on each project.