There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

STORM Act
Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STORM Act
Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

STORM Act
Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

STORM Act
Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Act of 2020

Short Title(s) as Introduced

STORM Act
Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to allow the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to provide capitalization grants to States to establish revolving funds to provide hazard mitigation assistance to reduce risks from disasters and natural hazards, and other related environmental harm.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/01/2021Became Public Law No: 116-284.
01/01/2021Signed by President.
12/21/2020Presented to President.
12/18/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
12/09/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/10/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-249.
03/09/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/01/2021Became Public Law No: 116-284.
01/01/2021Signed by President.
12/21/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/18/2020-12:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/18/2020-12:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7264-7266)
12/18/2020-12:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3418.
12/18/2020-12:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7264-7268)
12/18/2020-12:12pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/14/2020-2:24pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/14/2020-1:35pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7370-7372)
12/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 proposed by Senator Inhofe for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S7377; text: CR S7370-7372) In the nature of a substitute.
12/09/2020SenateThe committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7375-7377)
12/09/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7375-7377)
08/10/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511.
08/10/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-249.
03/11/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/09/2020SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 03/11/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/11/2020
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/08/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/09/2020 Referred to
03/11/2020 Markup by
08/10/2020 Reported by S. Rept. 116-249

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3418. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (08/10/2020)

Safeguarding Tomorrow through Ongoing Risk Mitigation Act of 2020 or the STORM Act

This bill authorizes the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to enter into agreements with any state or Indian tribal government to make capitalization grants for the establishment of hazard mitigation revolving loan funds.

Such funds shall provide funding assistance to local governments to carry out projects to reduce disaster risk in order to decrease the loss of life and property, the cost of insurance claims, and federal disaster payments.

FEMA shall not be liable for any claim based on the exercise or performance of, or the failure to exercise or perform, a discretionary function or duty by FEMA or by a FEMA employee in carrying out this bill.