There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Great American Outdoors Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 54, United States Code, to establish, fund, and provide for the use of amounts in a National Parks and Public Land Legacy Restoration Fund to address the maintenance backlog of the National Park Service, the United States Fish and Wildlife Service, the Bureau of Land Management, the Forest Service, and the Bureau of Indian Education, and to provide permanent, dedicated funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/09/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/10/2020Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 438.
Action By: Senate
03/09/2020Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/09/2020
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 03/09/2020
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/09/2020
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/09/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/10/2020
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/10/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 03/11/2020
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 03/12/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/08/2020

Committees (0)

As of 07/02/2020 text has not been received for S.3422 - Great American Outdoors Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3422. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/09/2020)

Great American Outdoors Act

This bill establishes the National Parks and Public Land Legacy Restoration Fund to support deferred maintenance projects on federal lands.

For FY2021-FY2025, there shall be deposited into the fund an amount equal to 50% of all federal revenues from the development of oil, gas, coal, or alternative or renewable energy on federal lands and waters. Deposited amounts must not exceed $1.9 billion for any fiscal year.

The fund must be used for priority deferred maintenance projects in specified systems that are administered by

  • the National Park Service,
  • the Forest Service,
  • the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service,
  • the Bureau of Land Management, and
  • the Bureau of Indian Education.

The Government Accountability Office must report on the effect of the fund in reducing the backlog of priority deferred maintenance projects for the specified agencies.

Additionally, the bill makes funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund (LWCF) permanent. The President shall annually report to Congress specified details regarding the allocation of funds to the LWCF. Congress may provide for alternate allocations using specified procedures.