There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Modernizing Access to Our Public Land Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Interior, the Secretary of Agriculture, and the Assistant Secretary of the Army for Civil Works to digitize and make publicly available geographic information system mapping data relating to public access to Federal land and waters for outdoor recreation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/10/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/16/2020Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
03/10/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 03/10/2020
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 07/02/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/21/2020
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/21/2020
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/14/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/10/2020 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining09/16/2020 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3427. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/10/2020)

Modernizing Access to Our Public Land Act

This bill directs the Department of the Interior, the Forest Service, and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to jointly develop and adopt interagency standards to ensure compatibility and interoperability among federal databases for the collection and dissemination of outdoor recreation data related to federal lands.

Interior, the Forest Service, and the Corps of Engineers must digitize and publish geographic information system mapping data that includes

  • federal interests, including easements and rights-of-way, in private land;
  • status information as to whether roads and trails are open or closed;
  • the dates on which roads and trails are seasonally opened and closed;
  • the types of vehicles that are allowed on each segment of roads and trails;
  • the boundaries of areas where hunting or recreational shooting is regulated or closed; and
  • the boundaries of any portion of a body of water that is closed to entry, is closed to watercraft, or has horsepower limitations for watercraft.