There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

No TikTok on Government Devices Act

Short Titles as Introduced

No TikTok on Government Devices Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit certain individuals from downloading or using TikTok on any device issued by the United States or a government corporation.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/06/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/06/2020Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/12/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/07/2020-10:54amHouseHeld at the desk.
08/07/2020-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
08/07/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/06/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5236-5237; text: CR S5237)
08/06/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 507.
08/06/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/22/2020SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/12/2020SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL]* 03/12/2020
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 03/12/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 07/20/2020
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/23/2020
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/12/2020 Referred to
07/22/2020 Markup by
08/06/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3455. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/12/2020)

No TikTok on Government Devices Act

This bill prohibits federal employees from using the social media video application TikTok on government-issued devices.

Specifically, the bill prohibits employees and officers of the United States, Members of Congress, congressional employees, and officers and employees of government corporations from downloading or using TikTok, or any successor application from the developer, on any device issued by the federal government or a government corporation, with the exception of specified activities (e.g., cybersecurity research).