Text: S.3501 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Considered and Passed Senate (03/16/2020)


116th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. 3501


To provide a 77-day extension of certain authorities for foreign intelligence and international terrorism investigations, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 16, 2020

Mr. McConnell introduced the following bill; which was read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed


A BILL

To provide a 77-day extension of certain authorities for foreign intelligence and international terrorism investigations, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Seventy-seven-day extension of authority to access certain business records for foreign intelligence and international terrorism investigations and for roving surveillance.

Section 102(b)(1) of the USA PATRIOT Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 2005 (Public Law 109–177; 50 U.S.C. 1805 note) is amended by striking “March 15, 2020” and inserting “May 30, 2020”.

SEC. 2. Seventy-seven-day extension of authority for individual terrorists to be treated as agents of foreign powers under the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978.

Section 6001(b)(1) of the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 (Public Law 108–458; 50 U.S.C. 1801 note) is amended by striking “March 15, 2020” and inserting “May 30, 2020”.

SEC. 3. Effective date.

This Act and the amendments made by this Act take effect on March 14, 2020.


Share This Section