There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to treat certain programs of education converted to distance learning by reason of emergencies and health-related situations in the same manner as programs of education pursued at educational institutions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
03/21/2020Became Public Law No: 116-128. (TXT | PDF)
03/21/2020Signed by President.
03/20/2020Presented to President.
03/19/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
03/16/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
03/16/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/21/2020Became Public Law No: 116-128. (TXT | PDF)
03/21/2020Signed by President.
03/20/2020SenatePresented to President.
03/19/2020-9:04amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/19/2020-9:04amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1710)
03/19/2020-9:04amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1709-1710)
03/19/2020-9:04amHouseMr. Raskin asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
03/19/2020-9:02amHouseReceived in the House.
03/17/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/16/2020SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1762; text: CR S1762)

Cosponsors (30)


Committees (0)

As of 08/11/2020 text has not been received for S.3503 - A bill to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to treat certain programs of education converted to distance learning by reason of emergencies and health-related situations in the same manner as programs of education pursued at educational institutions, and for other purposes.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.3503. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-128 (03/21/2020)

This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs to continue to provide educational assistance through December 21, 2020, for programs of education that have been converted to distance learning due to an emergency or health-related situation. Such assistance includes monthly housing stipends or subsistence allowances.