Text: S.3503 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-128 (03/21/2020)

 
[116th Congress Public Law 128]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 134 STAT. 221]]

Public Law 116-128
116th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to treat certain programs 
of education converted to distance learning by reason of emergencies and 
 health-related situations in the same manner as programs of education 
           pursued at educational institutions, and for other 
             purposes. <<NOTE: Mar. 21, 2020 -  [S. 3503]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 38 USC 3001 note prec.>>  CONTINUATION OF 
                              DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS 
                              EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE BENEFITS FOR 
                              CERTAIN PROGRAMS OF EDUCATION 
                              CONVERTED TO DISTANCE LEARNING BY 
                              REASON OF EMERGENCIES AND HEALTH-
                              RELATED SITUATIONS.

    (a) In General.-- <<NOTE: Determination.>> In the case of a program 
of education approved by a State approving agency, or the Secretary of 
Veterans Affairs when acting in the role of a State approving agency, 
that is converted from being offered on-site at an educational 
institution to being offered by distance learning by reason of an 
emergency or health-related situation, as determined by the Secretary, 
the Secretary may continue to provide educational assistance under the 
laws administered by the Secretary without regard to such conversion, 
including with respect to paying any--
            (1) monthly housing stipends under chapter 33 of title 38, 
        United States Code; or
            (2) payments or subsistence allowances under chapters 30, 
        31, 32, and 35 of such title and chapters 1606 and 1607 of title 
        10, United States Code.

    (b) Applicability Period.--Subsection (a) shall apply during the 
period beginning on March 1, 2020, and ending on December 21, 2020.
    (c) Definitions.--In this section:
            (1) Educational institution.--The term ``educational 
        institution'' has the meaning given that term in section 3452 of 
        title 38, United States Code, and includes an institution of 
        higher learning (as defined in such section).
            (2) Program of education.--The term ``program of education'' 
        has the meaning given that term in section 3002 of title 38, 
        United States Code.
            (3) State approving agency.--The term ``State approving 
        agency'' has the meaning given that term in section 3671 of 
        title 38, United States Code.

[[Page 134 STAT. 222]]

SEC. 2. EMERGENCY DESIGNATIONS.

    (a) In General.--This Act is designated as an emergency requirement 
pursuant to section 4(g) of the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 (2 
U.S.C. 933(g)).
    (b) Designation in Senate.--In the Senate, this Act is designated as 
an emergency requirement pursuant to section 4112(a) of H. Con. Res. 71 
(115th Congress), the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal 
year 2018.

    Approved March 21, 2020.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 3503:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 166 (2020):
            Mar. 16, considered and passed Senate.
            Mar. 19, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>

Share This Section