There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a Housing Assistance Fund at the Department of the Treasury.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/06/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/06/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2291-2292)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/06/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/13/2020
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 05/21/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/21/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/21/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/02/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/02/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/15/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/15/2020
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/15/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/18/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/20/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/20/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/20/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/20/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 07/20/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/20/2020
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/20/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/20/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/03/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/06/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3620. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/06/2020)

This bill provides funds for assistance to homeowners to prevent mortgage defaults, foreclosures, and displacements of individuals and families experiencing financial hardship after January 21, 2020. The Department of the Treasury must disburse the funds to state housing finance agencies and Indian tribes for the provision of such assistance.